HB0910

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

In the House - Third Reading Passed (136-0)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {525861/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (135-1)47
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {344539/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-0)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments64
House Requests Senate Recede64
Conference Committee Appointed64
Delegates Luedtke, Rose, and Patterson64
Senate4/9/20184/4/2018Senate Refuses to Recede66
Conference Committee Appointed66
Senators Pinsky, Zucker, and Bates66
House4/9/20184/4/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted69
Third Reading Passed (136-0)69

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 11:39 P.M.