HB0933 (CH0653)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crimes - Human Trafficking of Minor - Defense of Ignorance of Victim's Age

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings50
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.