HB0980 (CH0006)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons

Sponsored by:

Delegate McCray

Status:

Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2016


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/13/20152/13/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/18/20152/18/2015Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20153/31/2015Favorable with Amendments {225062/1 Report Adopted61
Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Turner) Adopted 61
4/7/20154/1/2015Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {983325/1 Rejected (59-77)62
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {853323/1 Rejected (1-128)62
Floor Amendment (Delegate Walker) {633227/1 Rejected (57-72)62
Motion Special Order until next session (Delegate Vogt) Rejected (52-84)62
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vogt) {153627/1 Rejected (54-77)62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/8/20154/2/2015Third Reading Passed (82-57)63
Senate4/9/20154/2/2015First Reading Senate Rules60
4/13/20154/13/2015Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/13/20154/7/2015Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/13/20154/8/2015Third Reading Passed (32-15)66
House4/13/20154/11/2015Returned Passed72
Post Passage5/22/20155/22/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/20/20161/20/2016Veto overridden (85-56)
Senate1/21/20161/21/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/5/2016 (Senator Conway) Adopted
2/5/20162/5/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9/2016 (Senator Conway) Adopted
2/9/20162/9/2016Motion Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Hershey) Rejected (29-18)
Veto sustained (28-18)
Motion Reconsider Vote (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted (29-18)
Veto overridden (29-18)
Post Passage2/9/20162/9/2016Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2016

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 16, 2016 8:24 A.M.