HB0998 (CH0461)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Physicians - Physician Licensing Reciprocity

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hill

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/18/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments {746783/1 Report Adopted48
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {243626/1 Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/19/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (134-0)49
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)61A
House4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.