2013 Regular Session



Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages

Sponsored by:

Worcester County Delegation


Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
2/7/20132/7/2013Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable Report Adopted51
Floor Committee Amendment {453494/1 Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20133/20/2013Special Order until 3/25 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted 53
3/25/20133/21/2013Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Barkley) Adopted54
Floor Committee Amendment {143393/1 Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/25/20133/22/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)55
Senate3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs53
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (43-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.