HB1013 (CH0036)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016

Sponsored by:

Delegate Beidle

Status:

Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/29/20163/25/2016Hearing cancelled
3/30/20163/26/2016Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15)55
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (28-16)55
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
3/18/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/18/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments {274561/1 Report Adopted48
Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) {413224/1 Rejected (51-88)48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/19/20163/17/2016Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Withdrawn49
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted49
Third Reading Passed (84-51)49
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation48A
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/28/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {499432/153
Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted53
3/29/20163/25/2016Favorable with Amendments {499432/154
Special Order until 3/30 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 54
3/30/20163/26/2016Favorable with Amendments {499432/155
Committee Amendment Adopted55
Motion Re-referred Finance (Senator Hershey)
Special Order until later today (President) Adopted 55
Motion Re-referred Finance (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-29)55
Favorable with Amendments55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
3/31/20163/27/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {453329/1 Rejected (17-29)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {733129/1 Rejected (17-29)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {183229/2 Rejected (17-29)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {593029/1 Rejected (17-29)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {483924/1 Rejected (18-28)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {263922/1 Rejected (17-29)56
Floor Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) {129430/2 Adopted56
Special Order until later today (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 56
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {593125/1 Rejected (17-27)56A
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {703021/1 Rejected (17-27)56A
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {953926/1 Rejected (17-27)56A
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {953925/1 Rejected (17-28)56A
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (28-17)56A
House3/31/20163/26/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments58A
Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (49-85)58A
Third Reading Passed (83-51)58A
Passed Enrolled58A
Post Passage4/1/20164/1/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House4/7/20163/31/2016Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted63
4/7/20164/7/2016Veto overridden (88-52)63
Senate4/8/20164/2/2016Veto overridden (29-17)62
Post Passage4/8/20164/1/2016Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.