HB1020 (CH0143)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Baltimore City - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rosenberg

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {415666/1 Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation52
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/4/20133/30/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/5/20133/31/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
House4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.