HB1074 (CH0665)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale and Fee for Golf Course Licenses PG 318-13

Sponsored by:

Prince George's County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
2/7/20132/7/2013Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20133/8/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
3/15/20133/15/2013Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {204637/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/5/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (131-0)69
Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.