HB1087 (CH0347)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/13/20152/13/2015First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/20/20153/18/2015Favorable with Amendments {213096/1 Report Adopted48
Special Order until next session (Delegate Beitzel) Adopted 48
3/20/20153/19/2015Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/23/20153/20/2015Third Reading Passed (111-29)50
Senate3/23/20153/20/2015First Reading Finance47A
3/25/20153/25/2015Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20154/10/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/10/20154/3/2015Favorable with Amendments {217074/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/11/20154/4/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)62
House4/13/20154/8/2015Special Order until later today (Delegate Davis) Adopted 69
House Concur - Senate Amendment69
Third Reading Passed (119-20)69
Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:45 P.M.