HB1092

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rosenberg

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20182/7/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
3/17/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {966986/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (133-5)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {547278/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)58
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (131-4)61
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 12:46 P.M.