HB1107 (CH0147)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative PG 411-13

Sponsored by:

Prince George's County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {305160/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (135-1)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
3/25/20133/25/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20133/30/2013Favorable with Amendments {444332/161A
Committee Amendment Adopted61A
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (36-8)61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted 61A
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted61A
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {583429/1 Rejected (9-38)61A
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {353724/1 Rejected (9-36)61A
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (39-7)61A
House4/6/20134/1/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (79-47)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:06 P.M.