HB1145 (CH0730)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Tarlau

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20172/9/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {145266/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/20/2017Reassigned to Finance49
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Finance
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Special Order until 10:00 pm (Senator Ready) Adopted 63A
Third Reading Passed (36-0)63A
House4/10/20174/5/2017Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:05 P.M.