HB1159 (CH0670)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs Facilities

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {503590/2 Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (117-20)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Finance52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/4/20133/30/2013Favorable with Amendments {137878/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/5/20133/31/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)62
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (114-18)67
Passed Enrolled67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.