HB1173

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Small Business Energy Assistance Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/1/20133/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {873792/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/2/20133/27/2013Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 60
4/3/20133/28/2013Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 61
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (98-40)62
Senate4/4/20133/30/2013First Reading Senate Rules61A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.