HB1211 (CH0486)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Schulz

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable with Amendments {172118/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings50
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.