HB1216 (CH0694)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Career Preparation Expansion Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20182/8/2018First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
2/21/20182/21/2018Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
3/6/20183/6/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
4/6/20184/6/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/6/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments {233991/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/7/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (126-12)64
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018First Reading Senate Rules64
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/20184/5/2018Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted67
Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.