HB1287 (CH0762)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission on the School-to-Prison Pipeline and Restorative Practices

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 762


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed48
3/18/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)49
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {924430/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (140-0)68
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 762

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:06 P.M.