HB1302 (CH0250)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders

Sponsored by:

Delegate Valentino-Smith

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {822614/1 Report Adopted44
Special Order until next session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 44
3/14/20183/11/2018Floor Amendment {793824/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (46-88)45
Floor Amendment {293929/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (49-85)45
Floor Amendment {903725/3 (Delegate Valentino-Smith) Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (116-17)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48A
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {258778/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Floor Amendment {403520/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted63
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-13)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments64
House Requests Senate Recede64
Conference Committee Appointed64
Delegates Dumais, Morhaim, and Corderman64
4/9/20184/3/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Special Order until later this session (Delegate Fisher) Adopted 68
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (87-50)68
Third Reading Passed (93-46)68
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.