HB1329 (CH0571)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Delegate Bromwell

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {866386/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed (138-1)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017First Reading Senate Rules59
4/5/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Finance
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {907478/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/10/20174/3/2017Floor Amendment {427477/1 Finance Adopted63A
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (139-1)69
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:06 P.M.