HB1366 (CH0176)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Instruction (Breanna's Law)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cardin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20142/10/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/20142/12/2014Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Hearing cancelled
2/24/20142/26/2014Rereferred to Ways and Means
2/26/20142/26/2014Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20143/15/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/15/20143/12/2014Favorable with Amendments {235268/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/17/20143/13/2014Third Reading Passed (135-0)49
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20143/23/2014Favorable with Amendments {404437/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/2/20143/24/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)58
House4/4/20143/28/2014House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (136-0)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.