HB1389

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect

Sponsored by:

Delegate McComas

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20142/12/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/20142/26/2014Rereferred to Judiciary
2/26/20142/26/2014Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20144/5/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/5/20143/30/2014Favorable with Amendments {242912/1 Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/7/20143/31/2014Third Reading Passed (136-0)67
Senate4/7/20143/29/2014First Reading Senate Rules63

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.