HB1402 (CH0032)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate McIntosh

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/18/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments {895064/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (90-46)51
Senate3/22/20163/20/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation49
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/28/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {429531/153
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted53
3/29/20163/25/2016Favorable with Amendments {429531/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/30/20163/26/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)55
House3/31/20163/26/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments58A
Third Reading Passed (93-42)58A
Passed Enrolled58A
Post Passage4/8/20164/8/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.