HB1415 (CH0361)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
2/20/20182/20/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {385964/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (114-22)47
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation48A
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {434234/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/31/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (113-25)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.