HB1456

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Offshore Drilling Liability Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barve

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (115-22)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments {548173/1 Report Adopted60
Floor Amendment {423121/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61A
Third Reading Passed (115-21)61A
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 9:47 A.M.