HB1492

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Blue Ribbon Commission on School Transparency and Accountability

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, A.

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/29/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments {825967/1 Report Adopted56
Special Order until 3/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 56
3/30/20183/23/2018Floor Amendment {673028/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84)57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/3/20183/25/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)59
Senate4/4/20183/30/2018First Reading Senate Rules61

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 4, 2018 11:12 A.M.