HB1515 (CH0429)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House3/4/20133/4/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/20133/6/2013Rereferred to Ways and Means
3/6/20133/6/2013Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable with Amendments {415364/1 Report Adopted49
Special Order until 3/20 (Turner F) Adopted 49
3/20/20133/17/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate Bohanan) {303022/1 Adopted50A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Guzzone) {503328/1 Adopted50A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Mitchell) {773128/1 Adopted50A
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {453327/1 Rejected (50-84)50A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Aumann) {963129/1 Rejected (46-90)50A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Haddaway-Riccio) {653927/1 Rejected (50-81)50A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Olszewski) {113926/1 Rejected (61-73)50A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Schuh) {453325/1 Rejected (46-82)50A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {183026/1 Rejected (56-78)50A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {813325/1 Rejected (3-124)50A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bates) {443028/1 Rejected (43-85)50A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50A
3/22/20133/19/2013Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted52
Third Reading Passed (76-63)52
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation52
3/25/20133/25/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted (27-20)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {133226/1 Withdrawn56
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {373525/1 Rejected (21-26)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {543529/1 Rejected (20-27)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) {283227/1 Rejected (16-29)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {863322/1 Rejected (17-30)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {283724/1 Rejected (19-27)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {163122/1 Rejected (14-32)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {803627/1 Rejected (13-33)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {303627/1 Rejected (17-28)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {913427/1 Rejected (21-26)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {893029/1 Withdrawn56
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {403128/1 Rejected (19-28)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {533726/1 Rejected (20-25)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {153123/1 Rejected (18-28)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {763321/1 Rejected (20-27)56
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {653222/1 Withdrawn56
Second Reading Passed56
3/29/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed (27-20)57
House4/1/20133/26/2013Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:06 P.M.