Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session



Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015 and 2016

Sponsored by:

Delegate Otto


In the Senate - Second Reading Passed

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/22/20162/22/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/7/20164/7/2016Rereferred to Appropriations
4/8/20164/8/2016Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable with Amendments {134465/1 Report Adopted66A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66A
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed (136-0)67
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016First Reading Senate Rules63A
4/11/20164/11/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/11/20164/7/2016Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.