HB1662

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {213390/1 Report Adopted46
Special Order until next session (Delegate Rey) Adopted 46
Floor Amendment {973520/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected46A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46A
3/16/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (123-11)47
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {447276/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (129-8)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.