HB1795 (CH0006)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pena-Melnyk

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House3/2/20183/2/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/20183/5/2018Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {906685/1 Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment {583825/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48A
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed51
3/23/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (43-4)52
House3/26/20183/19/2018Returned Passed53
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 10:52 A.M.