SB0015

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate11/20/201411/20/2014Pre-filed
1/14/20151/14/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/7/20151/7/2015Hearing 1/22 at 2:30 p.m.
1/26/20151/26/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/20151/27/2015Favorable with Amendments {114734/1 Report Adopted10
Second Reading Passed with Amendments10
1/29/20151/29/2015Third Reading Passed (44-0)12
House1/30/20151/30/2015First Reading Ways and Means13
3/10/20153/10/2015Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20153/17/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20153/27/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/27/20153/25/2015Favorable with Amendments {795762/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
3/31/20153/27/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1)57
Senate4/3/20153/29/2015Senate Concur - House Amendments56
Third Reading Passed (46-0)56
Passed Enrolled56
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:46 P.M.