SB0017

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies

Sponsored by:

Senator Montgomery

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate9/12/20139/12/2013Pre-filed
1/8/20141/8/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
1/9/20141/9/2014Hearing cancelled
1/15/20141/15/2014Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2/10/20142/10/2014Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:54 P.M.