SB0027 (CH0434)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding Extension

Sponsored by:

Senator Astle

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate8/27/20128/27/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
1/28/20131/28/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/20131/29/2013Favorable with Amendments {494132/1 Report Adopted14
Second Reading Passed with Amendments14
1/31/20131/31/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)16
House2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Environmental Matters18
3/8/20133/8/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
4/1/20133/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {730513/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-7)62
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.