SB0037

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs

Sponsored by:

Senator Zirkin

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/26/201210/26/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/8/20133/8/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judiciary43
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.