SB0043 (CH0373)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption

Sponsored by:

Chair, Finance Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate9/18/20179/18/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/3/20181/3/2018Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Finance)
1/29/20181/29/2018Favorable Report by Finance
1/30/20181/30/2018Favorable Report Adopted15
Second Reading Passed15
2/1/20182/1/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)17
House2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means18
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
3/12/20183/12/2018Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable Report by Economic Matters
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (132-0)63
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.