SB0059 (CH0401)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/3/201610/3/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/4/20171/4/2017Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20172/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/20172/28/2017Favorable with Amendments {714430/1 Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed with Amendments33
3/2/20173/2/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)35
House3/3/20173/3/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation38
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {500416/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.