SB0078 (CH0044)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session



State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted Prizes

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee


Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20162/8/2016Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/9/20162/9/2016Favorable Report Adopted19
Second Reading Passed19
2/11/20162/11/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)21
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Ways and Means23
3/10/20163/10/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20163/30/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/30/20163/25/2016Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
3/31/20163/26/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)58
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/12/20164/12/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.