SB0102 (CH0298)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/13/20171/13/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
1/27/20171/27/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/20171/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted13
Second Reading Passed13
2/1/20172/1/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)15
House2/2/20172/2/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation17
3/28/20173/28/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (136-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.