SB0109 (CH0442)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Senator Kelley

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/14/20131/14/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {168279/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Judiciary51
3/23/20133/23/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)63
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.