SB0120 (CH0160)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Awards

Sponsored by:

Senator Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/15/20161/15/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2/15/20162/15/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/20162/16/2016Favorable Report Adopted24
Second Reading Passed24
2/18/20162/18/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)26
House2/19/20162/19/2016First Reading Ways and Means28
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/11/20164/9/2016Favorable Report Adopted72
Second Reading Passed72
4/12/20164/9/2016Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (136-0)72
Third Reading Passed (134-2)72
Senate4/12/20164/8/2016Returned Passed68
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.