SB0124 (CH0443)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax Credit for Qualifying Employees - Sunset Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Peters

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20131/16/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2/11/20132/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {659135/1 Report Adopted22
Second Reading Passed with Amendments22
2/13/20132/13/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)24
House2/14/20132/14/2013First Reading Ways and Means27
3/15/20133/15/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {225063/1 Report Adopted64
Floor Committee Amendment {695369/1 Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/6/20134/1/2013Floor Committee Amendment {695369/3 Adopted65
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)65
Senate4/8/20134/2/2013Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (46-0)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.