SB0132

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report

Sponsored by:

Senator Zirkin

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/11/20181/11/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/15/20181/15/2018Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20182/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20182/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {468177/1 Report Adopted20
Second Reading Passed with Amendments20
2/8/20182/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)22
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary23
3/13/20183/13/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 13, 2018 2:16 P.M.