SB0134 (CH0571)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Small Business Relief Tax Credit

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/11/20181/11/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {879233/1 Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {215566/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)62
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (44-0)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:16 P.M.