SB0153

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Length of School Year Adjustment - State of Emergency

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20171/17/2017Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
1/20/20171/20/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed31
2/28/20172/28/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)33
House3/1/20173/1/2017First Reading Ways and Means36
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.