SB0154

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/17/20171/17/2017Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20172/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/8/20172/8/2017Favorable with Amendments {778678/1 Report Adopted19
Floor Amendment {863125/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted19
Second Reading Passed with Amendments19
2/13/20172/13/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)22
House2/14/20172/14/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation25
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20174/4/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/4/20173/28/2017Favorable with Amendments {480115/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/5/20173/29/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (123-12)63
Senate4/7/20174/1/2017Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments61
Senate Requests House Recede61
Conference Committee Appointed61
Senators Brochin, Norman, and Smith61
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Refuses to Recede66
Conference Committee Appointed66
Delegates Beidle, Folden, and Wivell66
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (46-0)64
House4/10/20174/5/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted70
Third Reading Passed (127-8)70
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Passed Enrolled70

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 11, 2017 2:35 P.M.