SB0158 (CH0390)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20171/17/2017Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20172/6/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20172/7/2017Favorable Report Adopted18
Second Reading Passed18
2/9/20172/9/2017Third Reading Passed (45-1)20
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation23
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/3/20173/27/2017Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed (125-13)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.