SB0161 (CH0385)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines

Sponsored by:

Senator Nathan-Pulliam

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/15/20181/15/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20181/17/2018Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {904037/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/22/20182/22/2018Third Reading Passed (44-0)32
House2/23/20182/23/2018First Reading Ways and Means33
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {615968/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)55
Senate4/2/20183/28/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments59
Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.