SB0163 (CH0051)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Electricians and Board of Electrical Examiners - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20171/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2/9/20172/9/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/20172/13/2017Favorable Report Adopted22
Second Reading Passed22
2/15/20172/15/2017Third Reading Passed (44-0)24
House2/15/20172/15/2017First Reading Economic Matters26
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/27/20173/22/2017Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
3/28/20173/23/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)57
Senate3/29/20173/25/2017Returned Passed54
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.