SB0165

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20131/17/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2/7/20132/7/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2/12/20132/12/2013Hearing cancelled
3/5/20133/5/2013Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.