SB0168 (CH0196)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits

Sponsored by:

Senator Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20131/17/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/18/20131/18/2013Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2/11/20132/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/12/20132/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {668879/1 Report Adopted23
Second Reading Passed with Amendments23
2/14/20132/14/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)25
House2/15/20132/15/2013First Reading Judiciary28
2/26/20132/26/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/1/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)59
Senate4/1/20133/27/2013Returned Passed58
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.