SB0174 (CH0328)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Behavioral Health Administration - Behavioral Health Advisory Council

Sponsored by:

Senator Eckardt

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20151/30/2015First Reading Finance
2/3/20152/3/2015Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20152/20/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/23/20152/23/2015Favorable with Amendments {457275/1 Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed with Amendments28
2/25/20152/25/2015Third Reading Passed (47-0)30
House2/26/20152/26/2015First Reading Health and Government Operations32
3/18/20153/18/2015Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/7/20154/1/2015Favorable with Amendments {836280/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/9/20154/3/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)64
Senate4/10/20154/3/2015Senate Concur - House Amendment61
Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
Passed Enrolled61
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.